Financial history JUBILEE TABERNACLE

Charity Number: 1160730
Charity reporting is overdue by 1630 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £5.80k £15.00k £0 £0 £1.50k
Total expenditure £5.15k £15.00k £200 £0 £1.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A