EDMONTON SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1160084
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
clairvoyant services and circles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Total income: £8,138
Total expenditure: £8,010
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England
Governance
Registration history:
- 22 January 2015: Standard registration
- 05 August 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.72k | £8.25k | £8.43k | £8.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.39k | £12.56k | £10.50k | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 16 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window