DEANSHANGER PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide sporting opportunities for the residents of Deanshanger and surrounding settlements by maintaining and promoting the use of the playing fields.. The promotion of healthy lifestyles by encouraging the use of the playing fields especially by the young in the village is a major aim of the organisation as is the development of the facilities including the sports pavilion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Creasey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Pether | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Marc Pether Lt Cdr | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £11 | £629 | £1.92k | £4.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £9.21k | £5.34k | £87.86k | £12.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 APR 2015
Charitable objects
4.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF LAND AND ANCILLARY OR COMPLIMENTARY BUILDINGS OR FACILITIES FOR USE BY THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF DEANSHANGER IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE (DEANSHANGER) AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: 4.1.1. SOCIAL, PHYSICAL TRAINING, GAMES OR AMUSEMENT; AND 4.1.2. OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE SOCIAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING, AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE LOCAL RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deanshanger Playing Field & Sports Club
Little London
Deanshanger
MILTON KEYNES
MK19 6HU
- Phone:
- 07865954779
- Email:
- marc.pether@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window