ZIMBABWE PENSIONERS SUPPORT FUND - UK BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In line with the charity objectives to relieve financial hardship, sickness and poor health amongst pensioners in Zimbabwe, in particular, but nor exclusively by making grants for food and medicines for Zimbabwean pensioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 13 May 2015: Standard registration
- ZIMBABWE PENSIONERS SUPPORT FUND -UK BRANCH (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY GRANGER | Chair | 09 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Anne Diana Tourle | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Henry Minchin | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Lindsay Williams | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mr Duncan Marshall Falla Grieve | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BETI-ANN MCLEAN | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Reginald McLean | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER BIDDULPH | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.88k | £119.26k | £286.68k | £87.40k | £123.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.81k | £396 | £284.47k | £84.48k | £123.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST PENSIONERS IN ZIMBABWE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS FOR FOOD AND MEDICINES FOR ZIMBABWEAN PENSIONERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Ulysses Road
SWINDON
SN25 2JR
- Phone:
- 01793 734718
- Email:
- betiann1@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window