Trustees KINGSTON NATIONAL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1160074

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIA BERNADETE MAY | Chair | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE ANDREA BARLOW | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN KHARIS STEVENSON | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE JUNE RUMSEY | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN ISOBEL MORRICE | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DESMOND BORLAND | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.