Financial history DURHAM SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1160068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.65k £2.67k £4.89k £5.82k £6.77k
Total expenditure £1.97k £2.51k £3.08k £3.91k £7.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A