Trustees DURHAM SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1160068

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE PATTISON | Chair | 01 April 1996 |
|
|
||||
James Hindmarch | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ailsa Rosemary Oliver | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Anne Forbes | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Johnson | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRACE LYNN | Trustee | 01 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PETCH | Trustee | 01 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PATTISON | Trustee | 01 April 1996 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.