SOUTHPORT AND DISTRICT DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 505742
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advice to parents and drop in centre containing books and games for children and adult to borrow
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2010
Total income: £3,166
Total expenditure: £334
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Disability
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Lancashire
- Sefton
Governance
Registration history:
- 23 November 1976: Standard registration
- 07 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- S D D A (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £1.17k | £3.89k | £3.61k | £3.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.44k | £2.55k | £789 | £960 | £334 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 15 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 18 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 20 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 17 February 2009 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS HADICAPPED BY DYSLEXIA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SOUTHPORT AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window