Trustees THE TUDOR HOUSE MUSEUM TRUST
Charity number: 1160419

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Mynard | Chair | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Follett | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Taylor | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Geoffrey William St Leger-Chambers | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MYNARD | Trustee | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anita Wilkins | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LESLIE BIGGS FCA | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.