Financial history GROW CARDIFF

Charity Number: 1161591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.71k £88.99k £128.99k £211.37k £231.24k
Total expenditure £65.50k £77.10k £100.56k £168.89k £211.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £19.97k £24.97k