Financial history VIETNAMESE BUDDHIST ASSOCIATION-UK

Charity number: 1162186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £11.25k £36.84k £14.10k £29.02k £8.17k
Total expenditure £3.85k £661.73k £27.30k £8.73k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A