SOUTHPORT BACH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choral performances of classical music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 15 November 1976: Standard registration
- BACH CHOIR (Working name)
- SOUTHPORT BACH SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr George Robert StJohn Talbot FRSA | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Stanway | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert McCulloch Russell | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Athena Kwasnica | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.94k | £3.22k | £12.68k | £17.99k | £30.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.35k | £4.78k | £14.29k | £16.43k | £32.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 October 2024 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 10 SEPTEMBER 1981 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 11 NOVEMBER 1993 AND 16 JUNE 1994 AND 21 OCTOBER 1999 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC OF HIGH QUALITY OF ANY PERIOD, BOTH SACRED AND SECULAR, BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 Waterloo Road
SOUTHPORT
Merseyside
PR8 3AY
- Phone:
- 01704578248
- Email:
- robertrussell1061@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window