VIRGINIA WATER COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school/childcare for 2-4 year olds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 28 January 2015: CIO registration
- 27 January 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 27 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1190734 MANORCROFT NURSERY
- VWCPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.95k | £147.22k | £149.60k | £156.10k | £152.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.41k | £128.60k | £143.60k | £159.92k | £157.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 36 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 August 2020 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 August 2020 | 45 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY:- (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART; (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN; (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window