YSTRADGYNLAIS VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to improve the wellbeing of people in Ystradgynlais & neighbouring communities. We recruit, place and support volunteers, promote volunteering opportunities, local activities and events; provide a centre for community use; support new initiatives; provide food to people in need; reduce waste, promote recycling and encourage reuse of products that may otherwise be disposed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,400 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
69 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Neath Port Talbot
- Powys
Governance
- 03 March 2015: CIO registration
- 22 December 2016: Funds received from 515094 YSTRADGYNLAIS VOLUNTEER CENTRE
- YVC (Working name)
- YSTRADGYNLAIS VOLUNTEER CENTRE-1 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Newton Gabe Thomas | Chair | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Gould | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hywel Jopling | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Rose | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.30k | £125.08k | £117.00k | £139.00k | £177.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.14k | £125.08k | £120.00k | £139.00k | £188.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £38.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.98k | £87.88k | £38.00k | £21.28k | £18.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- TO PROMOTE ALL OR ANY PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN YSTRADGYNLAIS AND DISTRICT DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND PROTECTING AND SAFEGUARDING THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AND ACCESS TO BETTER RECYCLING BY PROVIDING VARIOUS OPPORTUNITIES AND SUPPORT FOR VOLUNTEERS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CIO MAY A) PROVIDE A CENTRE B) GIVE AND EXCHANGE INFORMATION AND SIGN-POSTING WITH ORGANISATIONS USING VOLUNTEERS, ESPECIALLY THOSE VOLUNTEERS ATTACHED TO THE CENTRE. C) PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO SUBJECTS DIRECTLY CONNECTED WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CENTRE AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. D) HOLD AND CONDUCT CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS, AND PARTICIPATE IN ENQUIRIES. E) OBTAIN, COLLECT AND RECEIVE MONEY AND FUNDS BY WAY OF CONTRIBUTIONS, DONATIONS, LEGACIES, GRANTS AND ANY OTHER LAWFUL METHOD, AND ACCEPT AND RECEIVE GIFTS OF PROPERTY OF ANY DESCRIPTION (WHETHER SUBJECT TO ANY SPECIAL TRUSTS OR NOT). F) COLLABORATE AND CO-OPERATE WITH LOCAL STATUTORY BODIES. G) RETAIN OR EMPLOY PROFESSIONAL OR TECHNICAL ADVISORS OR WORKERS IN CONNECTION WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CENTRE AND TO PAY REASONABLE AND PROPER FEES FOR THEIR SERVICES. H) DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ystradgynlais Volunteer Centre
Remploy Building
Wind Road
Ystradgynlais
SWANSEA
SA9 1AF
- Phone:
- 01639845475
- Email:
- yvcvolunteering@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window