SEVENOAKS POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES TO DISABLED PERSONS IN SEVENOAKS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THEM TO ACCESS POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL. TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT. TO PROVIDE RESPITE TO THE FAMILIES OF THOSE WITH A PHYSICAL DISABILITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Greenwich
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 March 2015: Standard registration
- SPFC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW STEVENS | Chair | 03 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Kirstie Ball | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bestwick | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADAM MCEVOY | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.00k | £3.53k | £7.41k | £7.97k | £7.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £11.11k | £2.59k | £7.31k | £17.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 September 2024 | 443 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 January 2022 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2015
Charitable objects
CHARITY'S OBJECT ('THE OBJECTS') IS THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS IN SEVENOAKS BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THEM IN POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THIS PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Brick Cottages
Poundsbridge Lane
Penshurst
Tonbridge
TN11 8AG
- Phone:
- 07957108787
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window