ISCA COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current activity is focused on delivery of a community centre in Beacon Heath, Exeter. We are developing the centre as an important community resource that enables local charities and services to work in the community. We are building towards hosting some of our own community activities in the centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £66,900 from 2 government contract(s) and £5,586 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3038 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 23 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Hudson | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Pike | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Fletcher | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jayne Robinson | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Cranston | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jan Pearkes | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.82k | £97.79k | £114.49k | £138.98k | £171.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.13k | £69.91k | £89.79k | £120.17k | £139.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.90k | £66.90k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.24k | £46.62k | £46.18k | £9.55k | £5.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Mar 2015 as amended on 30 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- • TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF EXETER, DEVON, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: • TO PROVIDE SUCH ACTIVITIES AND TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE OR CENTRES AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS THE FOUNDATION SHALL OPERATE WITH CHRISTIAN VALUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Beacon
Pendragon House
Beacon Lane
EXETER
EX4 8LZ
- Phone:
- 01392 204979
- Email:
- trustee@iscace.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window