OLDHAM WORK CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY OR DISTRESS FOR ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF OLDHAM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oldham
Governance
- 29 November 1976: Standard registration
- 16 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- T A - PAK-AGE ENTERPRISES (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.53k | £16.63k | £9.92k | £10.46k | £12.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.45k | £16.21k | £14.73k | £14.10k | £14.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 14 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 06 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 06 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 24 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 24 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 13 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 13 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMMITTEE IS ESTABLISHED ARE AS FOLLOWS:- (1) TO MANAGE, PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE SCHEME FOR WORKSHOPS FOR THE ELDERLY, OLDHAM, AFORESAID WHICH HAS BEEN INAUGURATED TO PROVIDE ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF OLDHAM THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF REMUNERATIVE EMPLOYMENT UNDER PROTECTED CONDITIONS WITH FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY OR DISTRESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF OBJECTS SEE ABOVE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
OLDHAM METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window