THATCHERS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Payments of grants to individuals and organisations within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 April 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Thatcher | Chair | 20 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Andrew Farron | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KELLI COXHEAD | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIKE WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE LOUISE THATCHER | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHIL SMITH | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.97k | £18.68k | £75.90k | £77.57k | £18.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.09k | £20.58k | £81.91k | £76.56k | £19.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING OR WORKING WITHIN SOMERSET (WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE PARISHES OF SANDFORD, WINSCOMBE AND ADJOINING VILLAGES, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO INCLUDE THE RELIEF OF ANY EMPLOYEE OR FORMER EMPLOYEE OF THATCHERS CIDER COMPANY LIMITED (OR ANY ASSOCIATED COMPANY), OR ANY SPOUSE, BROTHER, SISTER, STEPBROTHER, STEPSISTER, ANCESTOR OR DESCENDANT OF SUCH EMPLOYEE, OR ANY OTHER PERSON WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES IS DEPENDENT UPON SUCH EMPLOYEE, WHO IS IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OR DISTRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Myrtle Farm
Station Road
Sandford
Winscombe
BS25 5RA
- Phone:
- 01934827413
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window