Accounts and annual returns BRADFORD AND BINGLEY CANOE CLUB

Charity number: 1160779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 14 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 18 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 14 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 14 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 September 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 23 September 2020 23 days late Download Open in new window