BRADFORD AND BINGLEY CANOE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bradford and Bingley Canoe Club and its members are dedicated to promoting canoeing and kayaking for fun, fitness, and friendship. The Club is active year round and there are planned activities throughout the week. Members of all ages are encouraged to compete in canoe slalom and down-river racing as well as river trips and social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 06 March 2015: CIO registration
- BBCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jane Anne Watkins | Chair | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Kevin Cresser | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Mackenzie | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Susan Robinson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jake Philip Sheffield | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Kathryn Gibbons | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.03k | £14.21k | £6.37k | £15.49k | £13.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.44k | £13.03k | £11.89k | £15.57k | £15.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.80k | N/A | £429 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 September 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 September 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF PADDLE SPORT IN THE UPPER AIRE VALLEY OF WEST YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Micklethwaite
BINGLEY
West Yorkshire
BD16 3JW
- Phone:
- 07730809326
- Email:
- chair@bradbingcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window