Accounts and annual returns AVON CAT RESCUE

Charity Number: 1162192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 December 2024 03 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2024 03 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2022 28 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window