AVON CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Avon Cat Rescue has been active for over 50 years. At premises in South Warwickshire, relinquished and stray cats receive sanctuary and care prior to rehoming. The charity does not practice euthanasia except on medical grounds and with veterinary advice, therefore non-rehomable cats may become permanent residents. The charity operates locally and, to a lesser degree, in adjacent counties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 15 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY SPICER | Chair | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HELEN HALL | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
kathryn unitt | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/12/2020 | 20/12/2021 | 20/12/2022 | 20/12/2023 | 20/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.69k | £150.01k | £110.24k | £142.99k | £236.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.99k | £111.16k | £117.23k | £133.93k | £145.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 December 2024 | 03 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2024 | 03 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 December 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO CAT WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG CATS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barn House
Chapel Street
Welford on Avon
Stratford-upon-Avon
CV37 8PX
- Phone:
- 01789750235
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window