COUNCIL ON TRAINING IN ARCHITECTURAL CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COTAC's activities are focused on advancing conservation education and training. COTAC uses an integrated lay, craft, specialist and professional approach to achieve its aims. The Council's related website, understandingconservation.org continues to be freely available as a COTAC on-line personal learning resource and a conference takes place most years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 July 2015: CIO registration
- 21 June 2016: Funds received from 1036263 CONFERENCE ON TRAINING IN ARCHITECTURAL CONSERVATI...
- COTAC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM YATES | Chair | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Fred Markland | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Netter | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Houchin BA Hons | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Gundry BA Hons | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
David McDonald BSc | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CAMPBELL MEADE TAYLOR MBE | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|||||
PAUL MCMAHON DIP ARCH | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.50k | £2.16k | £8.12k | £8.12k | £2.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.58k | £1.86k | £3.11k | £3.11k | £1.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
IT SHALL BE THE OBJECT OF THE COUNCIL TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ALL THOSE INVOLVED IN THE PROTECTION, PRESERVATION, AND SUSTAINABILITY OF THE HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT, AND TO PROVIDE KNOWLEDGE IN SUPPORT OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND SKILLS REQUIRED TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE IT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTIVES, BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, THE COUNCIL SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING AIMS AND POWERS TO: A) SET, MAINTAIN AND PROMOTE STANDARDS FOR CONSERVATION EDUCATION AND TRAINING; B) DEVELOP, PRODUCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING MATERIALS: C) COLLABORATE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND AGENCIES WITH INTERESTS IN CONSERVATION WITH A VIEW TO INFLUENCING AND PROMOTING RELEVANT ISSUES; D) MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP THE COUNCIL?S DIGITAL RESOURCES TO ENSURE THEIR RELEVANCE FOR THE SECTOR AND THE PUBLIC; E) PROMOTE COURSES AT ALL LEVELS IN CONSERVATION OF THE HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT WHICH ARE RELEVANT AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH RECOGNISED CRITERIA; F) PUBLISH RELEVANT MATERIAL; G) ARRANGE SEMINARS, CONFERENCES AND PARTICIPATE IN EXHIBITIONS RELATING TO RELEVANT HERITAGE ISSUES; H) PROVIDE BURSARIES AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR RELEVANT STUDIES AND COURSE ATTENDANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUILDING CRAFTS COLLEGE
KENNARD ROAD
LONDON
E15 1AH
- Phone:
- 02085221705
- Email:
- info@cotac.global
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window