HARRY & ED'S ASPIRATION RAISING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with local schools to support children and young people in gaining experiences that raise self-esteem, confidence and aspirations, in order to open their eyes to possibilities that might not otherwise ween within their reach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 April 2015: CIO registration
- HEART (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven William Barker | Chair | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANA TERESA RUBIO HALL | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JAMES BARKER | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACK EDWARD BARKER | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JESSIE MCGAVIN | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ANDRE SLY | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARGARET BARKER | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MACFIE HENDRY | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
OMAR WALEED KHAN | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG PETER HAWKES | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSS MICHAEL CHAMPION | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA RUBY LUCILLA CHARIS MELLOR | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.45k | £4.42k | £4.19k | £8.08k | £5.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.20k | £360 | £214 | £6.47k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £800 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 March 2025 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 March 2025 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2024 | 375 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2024 | 375 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2022 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2022 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THAT WILL RAISE THEIR ASPIRATIONS, BROADEN THEIR EXPERIENCES, DEVELOP SKILLS AND MOTIVATE THEM TO BE THE BEST THEY CAN BE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Vicarage Road
BAGSHOT
GU19 5EJ
- Phone:
- 01276475986
- Email:
- HEARTCHARITYFUND@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window