Trustees MONKCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO
Charity number: 1160426

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MAY BELL | Chair | 11 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Brannen | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Connelly | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Mclaughlin | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Connelly | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stevielee Sayers | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Black | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Middleton | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Brumwell | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.