A.R.I.C.D.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and maintaining standards of work in the diagnosing and testing of children, particularly using the Griffiths scales; Fostering studies and research designed to increase knowledge and understanding of developmental problems in young children; and organising meetings for exchange of ideas and development of activities designed to help the development of children worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- China
- Dubai
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Philippines
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 24 March 2015: CIO registration
- 23 March 2023: Funds received from 252115 ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN INFANT AND CHILD DEVEL...
- ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN INFANT AND CHILD DEVELOPMENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SUSAN BLOOMFIELD FRCPCH | Chair | 09 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marta Kalas | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louis Coke | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Lane | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kavitha Gunasuntharam FRCPCH | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Stroud Professor | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Green | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Solange Maria Fernandes Fale | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAULA MCALINDEN | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.54k | £71.58k | £123.47k | £160.14k | £174.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.45k | £25.03k | £52.95k | £64.02k | £74.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Mar 2015 as amended on 24 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF BABIES AND YOUNG CHILDREN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- 1. PROMOTING AND MAINTAINING STANDARDS OF WORK IN THE DIAGNOSING AND TESTING OF BABIES AND YOUNG CHILDREN, PARTICULARLY USING THE GRIFFITHS SCALES; 2. FOSTERING STUDIES AND RESEARCH DESIGNED TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROBLEMS IN YOUNG CHILDREN; AND 3. IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE, ORGANISING MEETINGS FOR THE EXCHANGE OF IDEAS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO HELP THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN WORLDWIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL DICKINSON
50 FOUNTAIN STREET
MANCHESTER
M2 2AS
- Phone:
- 01618177200
- Email:
- INFO@ARICD.AC.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window