GATESHEAD EDEN PROGRESSIVE SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the religion and religious philosophies of Spiritualism. Monday- Open Circle 7:00pm Tuesday- Meditation 6:00pm Thursday- Open Circle 7:00pm - Monthly special service with guest speaker announced on our website Saturday- every second Saturday of the month is our Open day, see our website for further info. Sunday- Divine Service 7:00pm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS KANE | Chair | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEENA LEE | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE GORDON | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JAMES JOHNSON | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH TERESA KANE | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE GORDON | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.54k | £2.69k | £2.66k | £6.79k | £13.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.73k | £4.49k | £5.15k | £5.21k | £9.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 January 2025 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Woodburn Gardens
Gateshead
NE11 9RT
- Phone:
- 01914611762
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window