GOLDEN DREAM FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Promotion of Community Participation in Healthy Recreation in particular for disabled people in the provision of facilities and financial support for participating in sailing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2015: Standard registration
- 08 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.56k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.28k | £60 | £70 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JAN 2015 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/03/2015
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ARE: (A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR FOR DISABLED PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR PARTICIPATING IN SAILING; (B) TO RELIEVE DISABILITY AND TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE SAILING BY DISABLED PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH CO-ORDINATION AND INTEGRATION WITH THE EXISTING STRUCTURE OF SAILING ASSOCIATIONS AND CLUBS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window