BIRTLEY SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monday at 7.30pm Divine Service, Monday & Thursday 6pm to 7pm Spiritual Healing, Wednesday (1st of the month) 7.00pm Lyceum Group, Wednesday 7.00pm Members Developing Class, Thursday at 7.30pm Public Open Circle. Thursday at 7.30pm Special Service once a month, Saturday 10am to 4pm Workshops every two months.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
Governance
- 28 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Lines | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE BRIGGS | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hetherington | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Best | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria McKeough | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Grimes | Trustee | 07 February 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.39k | £15.11k | £12.28k | £12.38k | £12.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.77k | £5.05k | £7.15k | £6.35k | £7.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Joicey Gardens
STANLEY
County Durham
DH9 0PL
- Phone:
- 07776213933
- Email:
- GRIMESRAYGRIMES@OUTLOOK.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window