Financial history UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES INFORMATION SYSTEMS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1161218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.22m £933.72k £938.05k £1.80m £2.19m
Total expenditure £1.86m £755.18k £754.48k £1.37m £1.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £722 N/A £2.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £604.78k £678.74k £717.16k £765.86k £882.11k
Income - Charitable activities £915.73k £248.68k £219.83k £1.01m £1.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.43k £6.29k £349 £21.35k £64.37k
Income - Other £686.82k £0 £712 £0 £2.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £991.12k £256.34k £189.64k £752.42k £928.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £871.88k £498.83k £564.85k £615.77k £884.84k
Expenditure - Governance £48.33k £40.28k £39.30k £0 £82.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0