SIR THOMAS WIDDRINGTON (EDUCATIONAL) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of persons under the age of 25 years who are resident inthe area comprising the Parishes ofStamfordham,Belsay,Capheaton and Matfen or who have a parent or parents so resident or who have attended as apupil at a school in Stamfordham or Belsay who are in need of financial assisstanc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northumberland
Governance
- 26 November 1976: Standard registration
- SIR THOMAS WIDDRINGTON'S ENDOWED SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Brown | Chair | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ann Mckinney | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lawson | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Carr | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Hutt | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILL BLISSETT | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Patrick O'Neill | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BOYLAN | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.92k | £21.95k | £21.83k | £22.04k | £23.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.17k | £21.28k | £15.52k | £22.84k | £20.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 29 JUNE 1878, 3 OCTOBER 1895 AND 7 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION ( INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE PARISHES OF STAMFORDHAM, BELSAY, CAPHEATON AND MATFEN OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT OR WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED AS A PUPIL AT A SCHOOL IN STAMFORDHAM OR BELSAY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE B) PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR AND THEREFORE ADVANCE EDUCATION AT ANY SCHOOL SITUATED IN EITHER OF THE PARISHES OF STAMFORDHAM AND BELSAY. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 7 JUNE 199
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF STAMFORDHAM, BELSAY, CAPHEATON AND MATFEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dissington Hall
Dalton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE18 0AD
- Phone:
- 0000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window