THE LAING ART GALLERY

Charity number: 505783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Laing Art Gallery was founded in 1901 by Alexander Laing. The present site of the Gallery was suggested in 1899 and the following year Alexander Laing offered --£20,000 to the local council, which unanimously accepted his generous donation. The Laing in now managed on behalf of Newcastle City Council by Tyne & Wear Archives & Museums.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEWCASTLE CITY COUNCIL Trustee
JOHN WIGHAM RICHARDSON CHARITY
Received: On time
ELSWICK CRUDDAS RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT PRINCIPAL REGISTRY 22 JANUARY 1913 AND CODICIL OF 21 SEPTEMBER 1911
Charitable objects
TO PURCHASE FOR THE LAING ART GALLERY WORKS OF ART EXECUTED BY ARTISTS BORN OR DWELLING IN THE COUNTIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE NORTHUMBERLAND AND DURHAM OR ANY OF THEM, AND FOR GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE LAING ART GALLERY WILLIAM GLOVER TRUST.
Area of benefit
COUNTY AND CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Registration history
  • 03 February 1977 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Tyne & Wear Archives & Museums
Discovery Museum
Blandford Square
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 4JA
Phone:
01912772158