THE ASSOCIATION OF MEMBERS OF INDEPENDENT MONITORING BOARDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Membership training and support. Advocacy Communications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- AMIMB (Working name)
- ASOCIATION OF MEMBERS OF INDEPENDENT MONITORING BOARDS (Previous name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.42k | £12.39k | £6.18k | £4.95k | £3.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.16k | £6.03k | £5.36k | £6.00k | £4.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE, INFORM AND SUPPORT MEMBERS OF INDEPENDENT MONITORING BOARDS OF PENAL INSTITUTIONS, IMMIGRATION REMOVAL CENTRES AND SHORT-TERM HOLDING FACILITIES IN ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE LAW, THE TREATMENT OF OFFENDERS AND ALL OTHER MATTERS RELATIVE TO THEIR ROLE TO ENABLE THEM TO PERFORM THEIR DUTIES IN THE MOST COMPETENT AND EFFICIENT MANNER AND TO THAT END (BUT NOT OTHERWISE) TO ISSUE PUBLICATIONS, PROMOTE CONFERENCES AND KEEP WELL INFORMED OF DEVELOPMENTS IN THE LAW AND THE PRISON RULES AND ANY DIRECTIVES OR CIRCULARS ON SUCH SUBJECTS. TO EDUCATE AND INFORM THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE TREATMENT OF OFFENDERS AND THE ROLE PLAYED BY MEMBERS OF INDEPENDENT MONITORING BOARDS IN THE ABOVE INSTITUTIONS, CENTRES AND FACILITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window