Financial history DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 505785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £3.24k £1.32k £321 £14 £2.97k
Total expenditure £4.39k £3.16k £2.22k £3.63k £5.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A