Governing document DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity number: 505785

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/12/1955 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/1976 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 03/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.