Trustees DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity number: 505785

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Gregory | Chair | 01 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Sarwar | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carole Elter | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jean Ellison | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Clive Moore | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Suter | Trustee | 01 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN HOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.