Accounts and annual returns THE BROOKSIDE CHARITY

Charity number: 1162421
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 March 2024 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window