HAMPTON HILL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church provides religious services for public worship, including the dissemination of Spiritualist teaching and philosophy, together with special services throughout the year, along with events and functions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 29 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Edward Richard McDermott | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Carter | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bush | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara Langridge | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Christopher Thomas | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Emanuel | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARGARET TWYCROSS | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Ann Hazell | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA PAMELA SMOOTHY | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ANTHONY TWYCROSS | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.92k | £7.28k | £6.86k | £8.41k | £19.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.88k | £7.17k | £5.97k | £13.39k | £13.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hampton Hill Spiritualist Church
1 Angel Close
Hampton Hill
Hampton
TW12 1RG
- Phone:
- 07845641627
- Email:
- hamptonhillsc@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window