PORTSMOUTH TEMPLE OF SPIRITUALISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church provides religious services for public worship, including dissemination of Spiritualist teaching and philosophy, together with special services throughout the year, along with events and functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JANE FRY | Chair | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH MARY DYER MAAT FCA | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
julian hayes | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHEELAGH KEATING | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HAYES | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RABBIA BIBBY JOAN WREN | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY BEDFORD-FORDE | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Wren | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE JACQUELINE ENGLISH | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH HAYES | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY KNIGHT | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.77k | £11.87k | £14.97k | £22.14k | £15.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.61k | £17.00k | £17.86k | £17.78k | £16.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Portsmouth Temple of Spirituali
73a Victoria Road South
SOUTHSEA
PO5 2BU
- Phone:
- 02392817588
- Email:
- portstemple.snu@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window