THE WHEELCHAIR FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wheelchair Football Association (WFA) is the lead organisation for the sport of Powerchair Football in England. The WFA aim to ensure that Powerchair Football is accessible to its target audience. We encourage and promote the sport of Powerchair Football with the object of improving conditions of life and to assist in their integration into the game of football and to society as a whole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- THE WFA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Williams | Chair | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Evans | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Cook OBE | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Humphries | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW STEVENS | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
PAUL GORMAN | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Jon Bolding | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Jack Dowding | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEE BRENNAN | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE MCNICOL | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.09k | £77.58k | £123.61k | £201.77k | £214.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.14k | £87.99k | £129.09k | £163.83k | £200.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE WFA CIO ARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR THE SPORT OF WHEELCHAIR FOOTBALL, FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL DISABLED PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR NON-COMPETITIVE AND COMPETITIVE SPORT TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS AND ASSIST IN THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Birmingham County FA
Ray Hall Lane
BIRMINGHAM
B43 6JF
- Phone:
- 07957 108787
- Email:
- Secretary@thewfa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window