MAIN STREET COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HOLD REGULAR RELIGIOUS SERVICES ON SUNDAYS THAT ARE OPEN TO ALL. OUR PREMISES ARE USED FOR MARRIAGES, DEDICATION OF CHILDREN AND FOR FUNERALS. WE UNDERTAKE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR OTHER ORGANISATIONS THAT WE REGARD TO BE CONSISTENT WITH THE PRACTICAL APPLICATION OF CHRISTIAN BELIEFS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFERY PETER WOOD BSC, CENG | Chair | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW BASDEN | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Susan May Spilman | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr GARETH JOHN MORGAN | Trustee | 31 May 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.13k | £50.93k | £89.33k | £72.89k | £56.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.11k | £43.78k | £54.85k | £66.98k | £58.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AT THE SAID FRODSHAM EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP AND ELSEWHERE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DECLARATION OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE CONSTITUTION
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 THE BEECHES
CHESTER ROAD
HELSBY
FRODSHAM
WA6 0QL
- Phone:
- 01928722177
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window