FRIENDS OF WILMSLOW HEALTH CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 05 February 2015: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF WHC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY STAFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA RAILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MARY STRETFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALI MACKENZIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY CAIDAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN MCDONNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF WILMSLOW HEALTH CENTRE IN CHESHIRE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 01625521231
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window