PALESTINIAN ANIMAL LEAGUE SOLIDARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting humane behaviour towards animals in the occupied Palestinian territories by providing care, protection, treatment and security for animals which are in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances or ill usage and to educate the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general and the prevention of cruelty and suffering among animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- PALS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.30k | £30.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.63k | £36.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 07 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window