Accounts and annual returns COWES SAILABILITY CLUB

Charity number: 1161473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 14 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 13 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 13 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 16 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window