Financial history COWES SAILABILITY CLUB

Charity number: 1161473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £38.10k £13.28k £24.80k £27.40k £76.43k
Total expenditure £11.54k £26.04k £21.77k £24.12k £35.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A