JCT - JOINING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JCT helps refugees, asylum-seekers and homeless people in the West Midlands to resolve their problems accessing secure accommodation, benefits, and asylum approval. Each year we help hundreds of clients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 2016: Standard registration
- JCT - Joining Communities Together (Working name)
- HEARTCRY (Previous name)
- JESUS ARMY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- JESUS ARMY CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- JESUS CENTRES TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Jones | Chair | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Mamhende | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIDACE MUGISHA | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ambrose Nkemchor Isibor | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Hughes | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Hopkinson | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £803.70k | £404.97k | £288.03k | £547.72k | £134.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.80m | £1.64m | £652.59k | £698.34k | £313.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £78.93k | £29.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £428.45k | N/A | N/A | £15.29k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £25.86k | N/A | N/A | £19.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £349.39k | N/A | N/A | £12.62k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £500.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £200.00k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.59m | N/A | N/A | £690.34k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £28.04k | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.61k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.19m | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/09/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/03/2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 SEP 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JUN 2020 as amended on 08 Oct 2021 as amended on 16 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN ALL CASES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS: 1.1.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS IT CAUSES, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 1.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 1.1.3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 1.1.4 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. 1.2 THROUGHOUT THESE ARTICLES “CHARITABLE” MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, THE SYSTEM OF LAW GOVERNING THE CONSTITUTION OF THE CHARITY IS THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Lamb Street
Coventry
CV1 4AE
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- info@jct.charity
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window