ROTUNDA AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur boxing club - Hub
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2019
Total income includes £5,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 21 April 2015: Standard registration
- ROTUNDA AMATUER BOXING CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Garvey | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Garvey | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frank Vaudrey | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alec McGowan | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Kearns | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.67k | £29.37k | £55.97k | £57.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.40k | £19.35k | £49.10k | £60.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | £5.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1144 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1144 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1509 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1509 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN LIVERPOOL, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rotunda Boxing Club
Lambeth Road
Liverpool
L4 1SH
- Phone:
- 01513450320
- Email:
- Rotundaabc1@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window