Trustees KENDAL RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1160980

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr STEPHEN GREEN | Chair | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roger James Burrow | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Blenkharn | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Rigg | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fleur Margaret Stanton | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hayton | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gwenda Park | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danny Airey | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
William COXON | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Arthur Perie | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wheatman | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Nicholson | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.