LES PETITS CAMELEONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Les Petits Cameleons is a school teaching French to children with French speaking background in the Cambridge area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 05 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Audrey Wakim | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jerome Boulanger | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Loan Chamayou | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helene Grislin | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Charles Roger Marcel Callu | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fabienne Ericher | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Godard | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alienor Vellay | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Celine Ramond | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE PAJON | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.03k | £62.37k | £41.89k | £50.82k | £73.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.56k | £67.71k | £43.01k | £47.43k | £61.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 August 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 August 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 July 2020 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 05 July 2020 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE FRENCH LANGUAGE SKILLS OF FRENCH SPEAKING CHILDREN AND THEIR CULTURAL KNOWLEDGE OF THE FRENCH SPEAKING WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 HAVERHILL ROAD
STAPLEFORD
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 5BX
- Phone:
- 07989124585
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window