CHESTER KITTY CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CKCR rehome cats and kittens in the Chester area. Any cats or kittens that are in need of a new home will be neutered, vet checked, have flea and worm treatment. All new homes will have a safety check We try and control localised feral populations by trapping and neutering feral cats whilst working with the local community. We provide advice, education to the community on cat behaviour and care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 26 March 2015: Standard registration
- CKCR (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE LANGTON | Chair | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pepper | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michele Evans | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Langton | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £24.28k | £8.61k | £3.77k | £20.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.51k | £7.85k | £7.60k | £6.49k | £17.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR CATS IN AND AROUND THE CHESTER AREA, WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG CATS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
190 STAMFORD ROAD
BLACON
CHESTER
CH1 5DE
- Phone:
- 07591976006
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window